blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0806672


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
03.05.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.06.2002  [2002/25]
09.01.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
28.06.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
30.06.2000 Request for examination filed published on  16.08.2000 [2000/33]
02.06.2000 Renewal fee
10.03.2000 Publication of search report published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Change - classification published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
20.08.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
20.08.1999 Renewal fee
01.07.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
26.09.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.11.1997 [1997/46]