Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0806672

EP0806672 - Method and apparatus for handling a sample [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.05.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.06.2002  [2002/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Helena Laboratories Corporation
1530 Lindbergh Drive Beaumont
Texas 77704-0752 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/46]For all designated states
HELENA LABORATORIES CORPORATION
1530 Lindbergh Drive
Beaumont Texas 77704-0752 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fertitta, Frank A.
P.O.Box 1693
Vidor, Texas 77670 / US
02 / Galloway, Edward L.
120 Cardinal
Lumberton, Texas 77657 / US
03 / Pavelka, Eldon J. (Jr)
5110 Avie Lane
Beaumont, Texas 77708 / US
04 / Ridgway, Helen J.
9675 Arkansas Street
Beaumont, Texas 77707 / US
05 / Petty, Bruce R.
7390 Click Drive
Beaumont, Texas 77708 / US
[1997/46]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/46]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date97303093.506.05.1997
[1997/46]
Priority number, dateUS19960016952P06.05.1996         Original published format: US 16952 P
[1997/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0806672
Date:12.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0806672
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/02, G01N33/483, B01L3/00, G01N35/10, G01N33/49
[2000/17]
Former International [1997/46]G01N35/02, G01N33/483, B01L3/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Gerät zur Handhabung einer Probe[1997/46]
English:Method and apparatus for handling a sample[1997/46]
French:Procédé et appareil pour la manipulation d'un échantillon[1997/46]
Examination procedure21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
01.12.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/25]
15.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.199903   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.1999
31.05.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0628822  (ORTHO DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 6, line 11 - column 27, line 40 * [Y] 6-8;
 [Y]US4736638  (OKAWA DOBSON [US], et al) [Y] 6-8 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 30; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO9505590  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-5 * pages 13-36 * * pages 46-49 *;
 [Y]US5411065  (MEADOR JAMES W [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 17, line 48 - column 18, line 64 *;
 [A]WO8302191  (BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 8, line 7 - page 9, line 36 *;
 [X]EP0479622  (TOA MEDICAL ELECTRONICS [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 16-26 *;
 [XAY]US5304347  (MANN KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 9 * the whole document * [A] 6,7 [Y] 10;
 [Y]WO9108464  (AKZO NV [NL]) [Y] 10 * page 1, line 17 - page 13, line 38 *;
 [X]EP0633456  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 9 * the whole document *