blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0807373 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0807373



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 119
07.05.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
07.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 24
07.05.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.05.1997 Drawings Search / examination 3
07.05.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.05.1997 Description Search / examination 14
07.05.1997 Claims Search / examination 2
07.05.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.06.1997 Reminder: revised request form for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
24.09.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.04.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.04.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.06.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
06.10.1998 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.10.1998 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
06.11.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 19
23.03.2000 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
06.04.2000 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
06.04.2000 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
25.04.2000 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.05.2000 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
03.08.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.08.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.10.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.09.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1