blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0807373


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.09.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  07.11.2001 [2001/45]
29.09.2000 (Expected) grant published on  15.11.2000 [2000/46]
14.08.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.05.2000 Communication of intention to grant
12.05.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.04.2000 Renewal fee
06.04.2000 Communication of intention to grant
22.04.1999 Renewal fee
12.11.1998 Examination report or reply
16.10.1998 Examination report or reply
05.06.1998 First examination report
03.06.1998 Examination report or reply
24.04.1998 Request for examination filed published on  10.06.1998 [1998/24]
03.10.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.1997 [1997/47]