blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0807373
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0807373Global Dossier 15.11.2000B1
EP0807373 19.11.1997A1
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69703512D 21.12.2000D1
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69703512T 31.05.2001T2
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB2313534 08.12.1999B
GB2313534 03.12.1997A
GB9709143D 25.06.1997D0
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9610124D 24.07.1996D0
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5894894 20.04.1999A
Priority number Date
GB9610124 15.05.1996