Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0807373

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
Examination procedure03.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
European patent granted15.11.2000
Opposition procedure17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit published on 07.11.2001 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.11.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:10.06.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980411
 
Event date:22.07.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980608
 
Event date:15.11.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:21.12.2000 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69703512
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20001221
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:16.01.2001 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
OWNER NAME:BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.
 
Event date:23.02.2001 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:07.11.2001 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20140521
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20140527
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:27.01.2016 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150507
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150507
 
Event date:29.04.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150507
 
Event date:20.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:29.07.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20160520
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20160520
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:07.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 69703512 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT