Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807373

EP0807373 - Control of a semi-mounted plough [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.09.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.11.2001 [2001/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agco SA
Avenue Blaise Pascal
60026 Beauvais / FR
[2000/46]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
Agco S.A.
Avenue Blaise Pascal
60026 Beauvais / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Szymczak, Dominique
4 rue de Tour de Ville
60000 Beauvais / FR
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Simpson, Paul Christopher
AGCO Limited
PO Box 62
Banner Lane
Coventry CV4 9GL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Simpson, Paul Christopher
AGCO Limited, PO Box 62, Banner Lane
Coventry CV4 9GL / GB
Application number, filing date97303101.607.05.1997
[1997/47]
Priority number, dateGB1996001012415.05.1996         Original published format: GB 9610124
[1997/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807373
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807373
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:A01B63/111
[1997/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/47]
TitleGerman:Regelung für einen halbgetragenen Pflug[1997/47]
English:Control of a semi-mounted plough[1997/47]
French:Réglage pour charrue semi-portée[1997/47]
Examination procedure11.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
08.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.11.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2000Fee for grant paid
03.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0494516  (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV [NL], et al) [XD] 1,2 * abstract * * column 7, line 56 - column 8, line 7 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 43 *;
 [X]EP0477041  (HUARD SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2533409  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4231432  (JENNINGS MARVIN D) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2627932  (HUARD SA [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0068381  (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *