Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0814233

EP0814233 - Gas turbine engine rotor disc with cooling fluid passage [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.10.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.12.2002  [2002/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
ROLLS-ROYCE plc
65 Buckingham Gate
London, SW1E 6AT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Broadhead, Peter
361 Uttoxeter Road
Mickleover, Derby DE3 5AH / GB
02 / Hoptroff, John
54 Lindon Drive
Alvaston, Derby DE24 0LN / GB
03 / Avery, Peter
10 Birchfield Close
Chellaston, Derby DE73 1SS / GB
[1997/52]
Application number, filing date97303673.402.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateGB1996001539423.06.1996         Original published format: GB 9615394
[1997/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0814233
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0814233
Date:04.02.1998
[1998/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0814233
Date:19.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:F01D5/08
[1997/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/42]
Former [1997/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  LI 
TitleGerman:Rotorscheibe für eine Turbomaschine mit Leitungen zur Führung einer Kühlflüssigkeit[1997/52]
English:Gas turbine engine rotor disc with cooling fluid passage[1997/52]
French:Disque de rotor de turbine avec passages pour le fluide de refroidissement[1997/52]
Examination procedure27.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
16.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2001Fee for grant paid
25.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2065788  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US3014269  (BARBOUR GRAHAM ALEXANDER, et al) [Y] 1 * figure - *;
 [Y]FR2552817  (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2635577  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 6 *