Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0812701

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure17.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
European patent granted02.12.1998
Opposition procedure03.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit published on 17.11.1999 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.12.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:18.03.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19980117
 
Event date:29.04.1998 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19980311
 
Event date:26.08.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:26.08.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED)
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:02.12.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:14.01.1999 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69700061
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19990114
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:02.04.1999 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:24.11.1999 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:01.01.2002 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB IF02
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20130619
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:31.07.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20130620
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:30.08.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20130703
Year of Fee Payment:17
 
Event date:01.01.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69700061 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
 
Event date:25.02.2015 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20140609
 
Event date:04.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 69700061 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B41M0005380000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B41M0005382000
 
Event date:27.03.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20150227
 
Event date:09.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69700061 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20150101
 
Event date:09.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R079 69700061 DE
Code Expl.: AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS
Free Format Text:PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: B41M0005380000
IPC CLASSIFICATION:B41M0005382000
Effective DATE:20150304
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150101
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140609
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20140630
 
Event date:16.10.1998 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:26.08.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:20.05.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:20.05.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA
 
Event date:06.03.1998 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA
 
Event date:31.10.1997 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:08.10.1999 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:08.10.1999 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261