blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0812701

EP0812701 - Thermal transfer sheet for printing images with metallic luster [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.10.1999
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.10.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.11.1999 [1999/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo-to / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirano, Toshifusa, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
02 / Ebihara, Shunichi, Dai Nippon Printing Co., Ltd.
1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP
[1997/51]
Representative(s)Smart, Peter John
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]Smart, Peter John
W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date97303971.209.06.1997
[1997/51]
Priority number, dateJP1996016873310.06.1996         Original published format: JP 16873396
JP1996018697628.06.1996         Original published format: JP 18697696
[1997/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0812701
Date:17.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812701
Date:02.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.08.1997
ClassificationIPC:B41M5/38, B41M5/40
[1997/51]
CPC:
B41M5/38214 (EP,US); B41M5/385 (EP,US); B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US); Y10S428/913 (EP,US); Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24843 (EP,US); Y10T428/24917 (EP,US); Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/273 (EP,US); Y10T428/2804 (EP,US); Y10T428/2822 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US); Y10T428/31678 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1998/35]
Former [1997/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Thermische Übertragungsschicht für das Erzeugen von Bildern mit metallischem Glanz[1997/51]
English:Thermal transfer sheet for printing images with metallic luster[1997/51]
French:Feuille pour l'impression par transfert thermique d'images ayant un lustre métallique[1997/51]
Examination procedure17.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/12]
11.03.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
26.05.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.1998Fee for grant paid
17.08.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.09.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/47]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[AD]JPS6330288  ;
 [AD]JPH01257082  ;
 [A]JPS63233884  ;
 [A]JPS63197689  ;
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880708), vol. 12, no. 241, Database accession no. (M - 716), & JP63030288 A 19880208 (TOPPAN PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890110), vol. 14, no. 10, Database accession no. (M - 917), & JP01257082 A 19891013 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL COMPANY LIMITED) [AD] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890119), vol. 13, no. 22, Database accession no. (M - 786), & JP63233884 A 19880929 (TOPPAN PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881213), vol. 12, no. 475, Database accession no. (M - 774), & JP63197689 A 19880816 (TOPPAN PRINTING COMPANY LIMITED) [A] 1-16 * abstract *
 [A]  - KENJIRO KURODA, "NEW COLOR THERMAL TRANSFER PRINTING MEDIA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ADVANCES IN NON IMPACT PRINTING TECHNOLOGIES, SAN DIEGO, NOV. 12 - 17, 1989, MOORE J, (19891112), no. CONGRESS 5, pages 524 - 531, XP000138928 [A] 1-16
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.