Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0814606

EP0814606 - Method and system for sensor array readout having reduced crosstalk [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Former [1997/52]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Weisfield, Richard L.
11520 Old Ranch Road
Los Altos, California 94024 / US
[1997/52]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [1997/52]Pike, Christopher Gerard , et al
Rank Xerox Ltd., Patent Department, Parkway
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB
Application number, filing date97304176.716.06.1997
[1997/52]
Priority number, dateUS1996066720220.06.1996         Original published format: US 667202
[1997/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0814606
Date:29.12.1997
Language:EN
[1997/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0814606
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0814606
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/217, H04N5/32
[2000/01]
Former International [1997/52]H04N5/217
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/37]
Former [1997/52]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Methode und Vorrichtung zum Auslesen eines Sensorarrays mit reduziertem Übersprechen[1997/52]
English:Method and system for sensor array readout having reduced crosstalk[1997/52]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour la lecture d'une matrice de détecteurs avec diaphonie réduite[1997/52]
Examination procedure05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
29.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2001Fee for grant paid
29.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0602475  (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 8, line 10 - column 10, line 24; figures 2,5-8 * [A] 2-4,6-10;
 [XA]US5041913  (ABE TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1,5 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 21; figure 6 * [A] 2-4,6-10;
 [A]EP0559207  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 6, line 17 - column 7, line 6 * * column 8, line 15 - column 9, line 28 *;
 [A]EP0653881  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,5 * abstract *