EP0819729 - Antistatic agent for polymer compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2002 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2002 [2002/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumont, Jean-Marie Gerard Louis 13, rue de l'Eglise 60140 Rosoy par Liancourt / FR | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Szary, Anne Catherine, Dr., et al London Patent Operation, GE International, Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 97304910.9 | 04.07.1997 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | FR19960008820 | 15.07.1996 Original published format: FR 9608820 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0819729 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0819729 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/16, C08K13/02, // (C08K5/16, 5:17, 5:20),(C08K13/02, 3:22, 5:17) | [1998/04] | CPC: |
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08K3/01 (EP);
C08K5/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1998/40] |
Former [1998/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Antistatik-Reagenz für Polymerzusammensetzungen | [1998/04] | English: | Antistatic agent for polymer compositions | [1998/04] | French: | Agent antistatique pour compositions polymériques | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 26.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0213788 (EL PASO PRODUCTS CO) [X] 1-7,14 * column 5 - column 6; example 3; table I * * claims 1-3,5,7 *; | [A]US4764428 (GLOYER STEWART E) [A] 1-17 * columns 5-6, lines 1-18; examples 1,5-12 * * claim 1 *; | [PX]EP0769522 (GEN ELECTRIC) [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * |