Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0823595

EP0823595 - Heaters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Stevenson, John
September Cottage, Plummers Plain Horsham
West Sussex RH13 6NZ / GB
For all designated states
Watt, Lindy Pamela Caroline
September Cottage, Plummers Plain Horsham
West Sussex RH13 6NZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]For all designated states
Stevenson, John
September Cottage, Plummers Plain
Horsham, West Sussex RH13 6NZ / GB
For all designated states
Watt, Lindy Pamela Caroline
September Cottage, Plummers Plain
Horsham, West Sussex RH13 6NZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/07]
Representative(s)Fry, Alan Valentine , et al
Fry Heath & Spence LLP, The Gables, Massetts Road Horley
Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]Fry, Alan Valentine , et al
FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street
Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB
Application number, filing date97305693.029.07.1997
[1998/07]
Priority number, dateGB1996001654106.08.1996         Original published format: GB 9616541
[1998/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0823595
Date:11.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0823595
Date:05.04.2000
[2000/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0823595
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F24C3/14
[1998/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   NL,   SE [2000/50]
Former [1998/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Heizgerät[1998/07]
English:Heaters[1998/07]
French:Dispositif de chauffage[1998/07]
Examination procedure27.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
06.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, PT
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.05.2002Fee for grant paid
16.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
20.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
07.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
07.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
DE28.12.2002
[2007/17]
Former [2006/14]BE25.09.2002
FR25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
DE28.12.2002
Former [2003/48]BE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
DE28.12.2002
Former [2003/46]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
DE28.12.2002
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US1475450  (SCHNEIDER AUGUSTUS G) [A] 1,2,4-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4471751  (HOTTENROTH FRED W [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US4846679  (KARDAS ALAN [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2242738  (GRATE GLOW FIRES [GB]) [A] 3 * figure 6 *