Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0827334

EP0827334 - Printing system, method of recording images, and ink cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.01.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.02.2006  [2006/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimada, Kazumichi
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
02 / Kakutani, Toshiaki
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Tothill, John Paul , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Tothill, John Paul , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [1998/10]Price, Anthony Stuart
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date97305880.304.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateJP1996022065602.08.1996         Original published format: JP 22065696
[1998/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0827334
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0827334
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0827334
Date:02.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/52, B41J2/21
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/10]H04N1/46
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/39]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Drucksystem, Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren, und Tintenkassette[1998/10]
English:Printing system, method of recording images, and ink cartridge[1998/10]
French:Système d'impression, procédé d'enregistrement d'images, et cartouche d'encre[1998/10]
Examination procedure31.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
05.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
21.12.2004Fee for grant paid
21.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04028806.0  / EP1515539
EP07007369.7  / EP1830555
Opposition(s)05.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/08]
Request for further processing for:21.12.2004Request for further processing filed
21.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.01.2005Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US4672432  (NOBUAKI SAKURADA ET AL.) [A] 1,2,14-17,19 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 34 * * column 4, line 13 - line 17 *;
 [A]JPH0825655
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 1996, no. 5, & JP08025655 A 19960130 (CANON INC) [A] 1,2,14-17,19 * abstract *