Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0823654

EP0823654 - Reflection-type liquid crystal apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.12.2002
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.01.2003  [2003/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okada, Shinjiro
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Mizutani, Hidemasa
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/07]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/07]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date97305937.105.08.1997
[1998/07]
Priority number, dateJP1996020743606.08.1996         Original published format: JP 20743696
[1998/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0823654
Date:11.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0823654
Date:25.11.1998
[1998/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1343, G02F1/13
[1998/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/31]
Former [1998/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reflektive Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung[1998/07]
English:Reflection-type liquid crystal apparatus[1998/07]
French:Dispositif d'affichage réflectif à cristal liquide[1998/07]
Examination procedure09.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/23]
15.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.07.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/05]
29.08.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200206   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0019208  (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6,11-14,17-24,27,28;
 [Y]EP0142326  (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 17-21,27,28 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 35 *;
 [Y]US5401330  (SAITO KEISHI ET AL) [Y] 11-14,22-24 * column 5, line 66 - column 8, line 36 *;
 [XY]US4799776  (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI ET AL) [X] 1,3,6 * column 3, line 6 - line 64; figures 1A,1B * [Y] 6;
 [X]GB2028529  (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1,3,5,15 * page 2, line 110 - page 3, line 103; figures 2,2A *;
 [A]US4492432  (KAUFMANN MEINOLPH ET AL) [A] 17,27 * column 2, line 32 - line 51 * * column 3, line 39 - line 63 *