Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0824298

EP0824298 - Telephone system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.06.2004
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARPER, John
21 Newbury Gardens
Romford RM3 8HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/08]For all designated states
Harper, John
21 Newbury Gardens
Romford RM3 8HH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/08]
Representative(s)Harman, Michael Godfrey
Holmwood
37 Upper Park Road
Camberley
Surrey GU15 2EG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/08]Harman, Michael Godfrey
Holmwood 37 Upper Park Road
Camberley Surrey GU15 2EG / GB
Application number, filing date97305975.106.08.1997
[1998/08]
Priority number, dateGB1996001658907.08.1996         Original published format: GB 9616589
[1998/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0824298
Date:18.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0824298
Date:19.07.2000
[2000/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04Q3/00, H04L12/54
[1998/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/17]
Former [2001/13](deleted) 
Former [1998/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fernsprechsystem[1998/08]
English:Telephone system[1998/08]
French:Système téléphonique[1998/08]
Examination procedure19.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/17]
09.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/30]
17.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/30]
Request for further processing for:10.06.2003Request for further processing filed
10.06.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
17.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200206   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2003
31.08.200307   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2004
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5539884  (ROBROCK II RICHARD B [US]) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 4, line 43 - line 47 * * column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 27 * * column 12, line 15 - line 64 * [A] 6 [Y] 4,5;
 [XAY]DE9418959U  (NETSERVE SYSTEMENTWICKLUNG UND [DE]) [X] 1,3,9 * page 6 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * claims 1,9 * [A] 2,5-8 [Y] 4;
 [Y]US4450554  (STEENSMA PETER D [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * * column 12, line 56 - column 13, line 68; figure 11 *;
 [A]JPH07212494
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 1995, no. 11, [A] 1-9 * abstract *