Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0825172

EP0825172 - Synthesis of 1-acetoxy-2-methylnaphthalene [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/09]For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
345 Park Avenue
New York, N.Y. 10154 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lim, Mu-Ill
21 Mayflower Drive
Trumbull, Connecticut / US
02 / Stasaitis, Linas
190 Stephens Lane
Fairfield, Connecticut / US
03 / Pan, Yuh-Guo
119 Woodbridge Drive
Stamford, Connecticut / US
04 / Anderson, James
1 Summit Lane
Bethel, Connecticut / US
[1998/09]
Representative(s)Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Ritter, Stephen David , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Former [1998/09]Cropp, John Anthony David , et al
MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road
London, WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date97306242.518.08.1997
[1998/09]
Priority number, dateUS1996069925919.08.1996         Original published format: US 699259
[1998/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0825172
Date:25.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0825172
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C67/297, C07C69/157
[1998/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/45]
Former [1998/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Synthese von 1-Acetoxy-2-Methylnaphthalen[1998/09]
English:Synthesis of 1-acetoxy-2-methylnaphthalene[1998/09]
French:Synthèse du 1-acétoxy-2-méthylenaphtalène[1998/09]
Examination procedure18.02.1998Examination requested  [1998/16]
31.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.01.2000Fee for grant paid
05.01.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0373668  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 5; table 1 * * page 6, line 9 - line 35 * * page 8 - page 9; claim - *
 [AD]  "INCORPORATED DYE-FORMING BLOCKED DEVELOPERS", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., HAVANT GB, (197501), vol. 129, pages 27 - 29, XP002044975 [AD] 1 * page 28, column L; example 4 *