blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0828222

EP0828222 - Intelligent information retrieval program generation system and intelligent information retrieval system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.02.2011  [2011/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[2010/11]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hayashi, Yoshitaka, c/o Fujitsu Hokuriku
Communication Syst. Ltd., 4-30, Masuizumi 3-chome
Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa, 920 / JP
02 / Oketani, Keiichi, c/o Fujitsu Hokuriku
Communication Syst. Ltd., 4-30, Masuizumi 3-chome
Kanazawa-shi, Ishikawa, 920 / JP
03 / Matsumoto, Shunji
Fujitsu Ltd., 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP
04 / Miyahara, Yutaka
Fujitsu Ltd., 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome
Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211 / JP
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/11]Stebbing, Timothy Charles, et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97306274.819.08.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateJP1996023416004.09.1996         Original published format: JP 23416096
[1998/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828222
Date:11.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828222
Date:17.03.2010
Language:EN
[2010/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/30, G06F9/44
[1998/11]
CPC:
G06F16/954 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1998/48]
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Intelligentes Informationswiederauffindungsprogrammerzeugungssystem und intelligentes Informationswiederauffindungssystem[1998/11]
English:Intelligent information retrieval program generation system and intelligent information retrieval system[1998/11]
French:Système intelligent pour la génération de programmes de recouvrement d'information et sytème intelligent de recouvrement d'information[2004/33]
Former [1998/11]Système intelligent pour génération des programmes de recouvrement d'informations et sytème intelligente de recouvrement d'information
Examination procedure04.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
17.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.02.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2010Fee for grant paid
01.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.12.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
30.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
17.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
27.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0314279  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,8 * page 4, line 52 - page 7, line 30; figures 1-3E *;
 [A]EP0578830  (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 3, line 18 - line 41 *;
 [A]  - SCHULZRINNE H, "WORLD WIDE WEB: WHENCE, WHITHER, WHAT NEXT?", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (19960301), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 10 - 17, XP000580078 [A] 6,8 * page 14, column L, line 48 - page 15, column L, line 18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.486966
 [A]  - BOERNER T, "DIE NEUE PROGRAMMIERSPRACHE JAVA REIF FUER DIE INSEL", CHIP ZEITSCHRIFT FUER MIKROCOMPUTER-TECHNIK, (19960301), no. 3, pages 212 - 214, XP000557373 [A] 6 * page 214, column L, line 30 - column R, line 60 *
Examination   - PITKOW J.E.; RECKER M.M., "Using the Web as a survey tool: results from the second WWW user survey", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, (1995), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1016/0169-7552(95)00018-3, pages 809 - 822, XP004013183

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-7552(95)00018-3
    - PERLMAN G., "Electronic surveys", BAHAVIOR RESEARCH METHODS, INSTRUMENTS, & COMPUTERS, (1985), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 203 - 205, XP009034230
    - HSU J., "The development of electronic surveys: a computer language-based method", THE ELECTRONIC LIBRARY, (1995), vol. 13, no. 3, pages 195 - 202, XP009034231
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.