Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0826381 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0826381



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 224
07.10.2005 Closing of application Search / examination 1
06.10.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
14.06.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.02.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.10.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
25.10.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
01.09.2003 Description Search / examination 1
01.09.2003 Description Search / examination 2
01.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
07.07.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
01.07.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.06.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.02.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.02.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.12.2002 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
28.11.2002 Claims Search / examination 1
28.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.11.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
20.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.08.2002 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
02.08.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.06.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.05.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
25.01.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
06.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 3
06.09.2001 Claims Search / examination 2
06.09.2001 Description Search / examination 6
06.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.09.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
05.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.06.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.02.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
27.02.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
25.01.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.12.1999 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
07.12.1999 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.12.1999 European search report Search / examination 1
22.10.1999 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
24.08.1999 General enquiry Search / examination 1
25.09.1997 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
25.09.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
25.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 34
25.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 31
25.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 30
19.08.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.08.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
19.08.1997 Description Search / examination 19
19.08.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.08.1997 Drawings Search / examination 2
19.08.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6