Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0826381


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
14.10.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  30.11.2005  [2005/48]
30.09.2005 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.06.2005 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.03.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.10.2004 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.09.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2003 New entry: Examination report or reply
19.02.2003 Examination report or reply
18.12.2002 Examination report or reply
18.12.2002 Change - request for further processing
16.09.2002 Application deemed to be withdrawn
30.08.2002 Renewal fee
04.06.2002 Examination report or reply
22.01.2002 Examination report or reply
18.10.2001 Examination report or reply
23.08.2001 Renewal fee
03.07.2001 Examination report or reply
23.02.2001 First examination report
22.02.2001 Examination report or reply
09.10.2000 Change - extension states
25.08.2000 Renewal fee
11.08.2000 Definitive list of designations published on  27.09.2000 [2000/39]
07.07.2000 Request for examination filed published on  23.08.2000 [2000/34]
03.12.1999 Publication of search report published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
20.08.1999 Renewal fee
16.01.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.03.1998 [1998/10]