Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0826381

EP0826381 - Swollen hydrogel for sphincter augmentation or for deforming tissue and method for its synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.10.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.10.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.11.2005  [2005/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MENLO CARE INC.
1350 Willow Road, Suite 101 Menlo Park
CA 94025-1516 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
Menlo Care Inc.
1350 Willow Road, Suite 101
Menlo Park, CA 94025-1516 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VanBladel, Kevin H.
1407 Carlisle Drive
San Mateo, California 94402 / US
02 / Bley, Robert S.
298 Stanford Avenue
menlo Park, California 94025 / US
03 / Wallace, John D.
2836 Coleman Place
Fremont, California 94555 / US
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Mercer, Christopher Paul
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97306281.319.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateUS1996070017020.08.1996         Original published format: US 700170
US1996070000420.08.1996         Original published format: US 700004
US1996070016820.08.1996         Original published format: US 700168
[1998/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0826381
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0826381
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L27/00
[1998/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/39]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gequollenes Hydrogel zur Verbesserung der Schliessmuskelfunktion oder zur Verformung von Gewebe und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung[1998/10]
English:Swollen hydrogel for sphincter augmentation or for deforming tissue and method for its synthesis[1998/10]
French:Hydrogel gonflé pour augmenter la fonction du sphincter ou pour déformer des tissus et son procédé de synthèse[1998/10]
Examination procedure26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
27.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.10.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/48]
14.06.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/48]
Request for further processing for:26.11.2002Request for further processing filed
26.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0684045  (HERCULES INC) [X] 1,3,7-9,12 * claims 7-13 *;
 [X]US4803075  (WALLACE DONALD G ET AL) [X] 1,2,6,10-13 * claim - *;
 [A]WO9319702  (UROPLASTY INC) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 25 * * claim - *