blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0826586

EP0826586 - Low profile bicycle pedal with top and bottom side clamping arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.09.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.10.2003  [2003/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]For all designated states
SHIMANO INC.
77, 3-cho Oimatsu-cho Sakai-shi
Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueda, Yutaka
24-17 Takabedai 2-cho
Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka / JP
[1998/10]
Representative(s)Pacitti, Pierpaolo Alfonso, et al
Murgitroyd and Company 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/10]Pacitti, Pierpaolo A.M.E., et al
Murgitroyd and Company 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date97306514.726.08.1997
[1998/10]
Priority number, dateUS1996070342826.08.1996         Original published format: US 703428
[1998/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0826586
Date:04.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0826586
Date:06.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1997
ClassificationIPC:B62M3/08
[1998/10]
CPC:
B62M3/086 (EP,US); Y10T74/2168 (EP,US); Y10T74/217 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/47]
Former [1998/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Fahrradpedal mit niedriegem Profil mit zwei Flächen zur Befestigung einer Platte[1998/10]
English:Low profile bicycle pedal with top and bottom side clamping arrangements[1998/10]
French:Pédale de bicyclette à faible encombrement avec des surfaces supérieures et inférieures pour la fixation d'une platine[1998/10]
Examination procedure05.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/10]
05.09.1998Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
24.02.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
24.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.2002Fee for grant paid
06.05.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
14.12.1998AT   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998BE   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998CH   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998DK   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998ES   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998FI   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998GR   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998IE   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998LU   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998MC   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998NL   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998PT   M01   Not yet paid
14.12.1998SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.199903   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.1999
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0531873  (DIADORA SPA [IT]) [X] 1-7 * figures 1,8-10 * [A] 8-10;
 [X]EP0619219  (MARUI SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0753454  (SHIMANO KK [JP]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP0372165
by applicantUS4838115
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.