Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0899662

EP0899662 - Backup and restore system for a computer network [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.04.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.04.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2000 [2000/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gold, Stephen
Rock Cottage, Stone Lane
Winterbourne Down, Bristol BS17 1DJ / GB
02 / Bathie, Jon
39 North Road, St.Andrews
Bristol BS6 5 AD / GB
03 / King, Peter
30A Knapp Road, Thornbury
Bristol BS12 2HD / GB
04 / Crighton, Ian Peter
15 Bishop Crescent
Shepton Mallet, Somerset BA4 5XX / GB
[1999/09]
Representative(s)Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell , et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited
IP Section
Building 3
Filton Road, Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/09]Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell , et al
Hewlett-Packard Limited, IP Section, Building 2, Filton Road
Stoke Gifford, Bristol BS12 6QZ / GB
Application number, filing date97306628.529.08.1997
[1999/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0899662
Date:03.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.03.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[1999/09]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [1999/46]
Former [1999/09]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System zur Datensicherung/Wiederherstellung für ein Rechnernetzwerk[1999/09]
English:Backup and restore system for a computer network[1999/09]
French:Système de sauvegarde et de restauration de données pour réseau informatique[1999/09]
Examination procedure06.09.1999Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/22]
23.12.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2000/22]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.10.1999DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.1999FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.10.1999GB   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.10.1999M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.199903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0410630  (IBM [US]) [X] 1-5,7,11,13-16 * page 3, line 31 - line 45 * [Y] 6,8,10;
 [Y]US5005122  (GRIFFIN DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 6,10 * column 2, line 9 - line 30 *;
 [YA]EP0769741  (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) [Y] 8 * column 2, line 29 - line 59 * [A] 9