Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0829733

EP0829733 - Electronic magnetoresistive sensor biasing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands B.V.
Locatellikade 1
Parnassustoren
1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Hitachi Global Storage Technologies Netherlands B.V.
Locatellikade 1, Parnassustoren
1076 AZ Amsterdam / NL
Former [1998/12]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
Old Orchard Road
Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Klaassen, Klaas Berend
7171 Anjou Creek Circle
San Jose, California 95120 / US
02 / van Peppen, Jacobus
972 Foothill Drive
San Jose, California 95123 / US
[1998/12]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/25]Calderbank, Thomas Roger
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [1998/12]Ling, Christopher John
IBM United Kingdom Limited, intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date97306708.501.09.1997
[1998/12]
Priority number, dateUS1996071807217.09.1996         Original published format: US 718072
[1998/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0829733
Date:18.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0829733
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0829733
Date:16.03.2005
Language:EN
[2005/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/09, G11B5/39
[1998/12]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1998/12]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Magnetoresistiver Fühler mit elektronischer Vormagnetisierung[1998/12]
English:Electronic magnetoresistive sensor biasing[1998/12]
French:Capteur magnétorésistif à polarisation électronique[1998/12]
Examination procedure16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
17.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.2005Fee for grant paid
13.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04017603.4  / EP1477821
EP04017607.5  / EP1469322
Opposition(s)19.12.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]US5404102  (GOKHALE KALYAN P [US], et al) [A] 1,7,15,22;
 [DA]US5309294  (CAHALAN DENNIS J [US]) [DA] 1,7,8,15,22 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6414702
 [A]  - J. M. KARP ET AL., "Adaptative compensator", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, (198406), vol. 27, no. 1A, ISSN 0018-8689, pages 166 - 167, XP002126184 [A] 8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890508), vol. 013, no. 188, Database accession no. (P - 866), [A] * abstract *