Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0844065

EP0844065 - Method of manufacturing a pipe liner bag [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHONAN GOSEI - JUSHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.
31-27, Daikan-cho Hiratsuka-shi
Kanagawa-ken / JP
For all designated states
YOKOSHIMA & COMPANY
175-3 Ooaza-Shinoyama, Ishige-cho Yuki-gun
Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
Get Inc.
2-12-4, 2-chome, Hanabatake Tsukuba-shi
Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
Oar Company
1-194-4, Hayashi Tokorozawa-shi
Saitama-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
SHONAN GOSEI - JUSHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.
31-27, Daikan-cho
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
For all designated states
YOKOSHIMA & COMPANY
175-3 Ooaza-Shinoyama, Ishige-cho
Yuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
Get Inc.
2-12-4, 2-chome, Hanabatake
Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP
For all designated states
Oar Company
1-194-4, Hayashi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kamiyama, Takao
17-2, Toyohara-cho
Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Yokoshima, Yasuhiro
175-3 Ooaza-Shinoyama, Ishige-cho
Yuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
03 / Endoh, Shigeru
856, Ooaza-Miyagasaki, Yasato-machi
Niihari-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP
04 / Aoki, Hiroyuki
1-194-4, Hayashi
Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date97306971.909.09.1997
[1998/22]
Priority number, dateJP1996031056221.11.1996         Original published format: JP 31056296
[1998/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0844065
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0844065
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0844065
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B29D23/00, B29C63/34, B29B11/04, // F16L55/165 , B29L9:00
[1998/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   FR,   GB [2001/04]
Former [1998/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Rohrauskleidung[1998/22]
English:Method of manufacturing a pipe liner bag[1998/22]
French:Procédé de fabrication de revêtements pour tuyaux[1998/22]
Examination procedure08.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
21.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2003Fee for grant paid
15.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB09.09.2003
DK30.09.2003
[2005/02]
Former [2004/45]GB09.09.2003
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0620104  (SHONAN GOSEI JUSHI SEISAKUSHO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 4 - line 22; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0548417  (GET INC [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 12; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0392026  (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1-3 * page 8, line 34 - page 9, line 32; figures 6A-6I *;
 [A]EP0412752  (GREAT LAKES & SOUTHERN RESEARC [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 39; figure - *