Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0828022

EP0828022 - A treated fabric, a method of treatment and a window covering product comprising such material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 20.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.
Piekstraat 2
3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
[1999/17]
Former [1998/11]For all designated states
HUNTER DOUGLAS INDUSTRIES B.V.
Piekstraat 2
NL-3008 AB Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / Jetzer, Jean Claude
Rendierlaan 31
6034 RS Nederweert Eind / NL
02 / van Olphen, Carolus Bernardus Petrus
Driehoek 1
4854 RL Bavel / NL
[1998/11]
Representative(s)Roberts, Mark Peter , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2015/28]
Former [2009/14]Roberts, Mark Peter , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/29]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2008/10]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2002/41]Senior, Alan Murray , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [1998/11]Allen, William Guy Fairfax , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97307021.210.09.1997
[1998/11]
Priority number, dateEP1996020263120.09.1996         Original published format: EP 96202631
[1998/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0828022
Date:11.03.1998
Language:EN
[1998/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0828022
Date:28.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0828022
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP30.12.1997
ClassificationInternational:D06P1/44, D06N3/00
[1998/11]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2015/28]
Former [1998/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IT,  LI,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Former [1998/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Behandeltes Gewebe, Verfahren zur Behandlung und Fensterabdeckung mit diesem Material[1998/11]
English:A treated fabric, a method of treatment and a window covering product comprising such material[1998/11]
French:Tissu traité, procédé de traitement et couverture de fenêtre avec ce matériau[1998/11]
Examination procedure10.09.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
17.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/11]
22.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
16.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.1999Fee for grant paid
25.01.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP98123804.1  / EP0911442
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000  11.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bridle, Andrew Barry
Bridle Intellectual Property Ltd
Unit 6F Thomas Way
Lake View Business Park
Sturry Road, Canterbury
Kent CT3 4JZ / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2008/01]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000  11.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bridle, Andrew Barry
Bridle Intellectual Property Ltd Unit 6F Thomas Way Lake View Business Park Sturry Road
Canterbury, Kent CT3 4JZ / GB
Former [2006/50]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000  11.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bridle, Andrew Barry
HLBBshaw Merlin House, Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2002/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000   
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Baker, Colin John
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/13]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000   
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Bridle, Andrew Barry
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/16]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000  28.02.2000  ADMISSIBLE
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000   
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Linn, Samuel Jonathan
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Former [2000/11]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2000   
Junkers + Müllers GmbH
Bolksbuscher Str. 27
41239 Mönchengladbach / DE
Opponent's representative
Bonsmann, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing.
Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35a
41063 Mönchengladbach / DE
 02  24.01.2000   
LOUVER-LITE Ltd
Ashton Road
Hyde Cheshire SK14 4 BG / GB
Opponent's representative
Linn, Samuel Jonathan
Mewburn Ellis, Hollins Chambers, 64a Bridge Street
Manchester M3 3BA / GB
03.03.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.06.2000Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.03.2001Date of oral proceedings
08.05.2001Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.05.2001Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M01)
26.02.2009Reply to a communication from the opposition division
26.02.2009Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.2011Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.06.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
12.11.2014Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
04.03.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
29.05.2015Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition15.08.2011Appeal received No.  T1754/11
18.10.2011Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
05.08.2011Appeal received No.  T1754/11
17.10.2011Statement of grounds filed
12.11.2014Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
12.06.2001Appeal received No.  T0681/01
19.07.2001Statement of grounds filed
31.01.2002Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M00) [2002/05]
08.05.2002Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2002/19]
28.11.2006Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
28.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2006Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
12.11.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.11.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.04.1999
BE28.04.1999
NL28.04.1999
DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
[2017/40]
Former [2017/03]AT28.04.1999
BE28.04.1999
DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
Former [2016/35]AT28.04.1999
DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
Former [2016/12]AT28.04.1999
DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
Former [2004/09]DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
GR30.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
Former [2003/46]DK10.09.2000
SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
GR09.02.2002
Former [2003/31]SE11.09.2000
PT31.03.2001
GR09.02.2002
Former [2003/19]PT31.03.2001
GR09.02.2002
Former [2002/27]PT31.03.2001
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE2152213  (ANGER WOLFGANG DIPL ING) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4-28;
 [A]EP0573772  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3766105  (CHAN K) [A] 1-4,10,11 * column W *;
 [A]EP0007745  (REED INTERNATIONAL LTD [GB]) [A] 7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2202488  (GRAHAM JAMES E, et al) [A] 7 * the whole document *