Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0833323

EP0833323 - Recording medium driving apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.12.2004
Database last updated on 17.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.02.2005  [2005/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho Ota-ku
Tokyo 145 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
ALPS ELECTRIC CO., LTD.
1-7 Yukigaya Otsuka-cho
Ota-ku Tokyo 145 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Masanobu
9-37 Nakajima-cho
Furukawa-shi, Miyagi-ken / JP
02 / Yamashita, Tatsumaro
4-3-39 Nishifunabasama, Shibata-cho
Shibata-gun, Miyagi-ken / JP
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Kensett, John Hinton
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Hertfordshire WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date97307270.518.09.1997
[1998/14]
Priority number, dateJP1996025571427.09.1996         Original published format: JP 25571496
[1998/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0833323
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0833323
Date:03.02.1999
[1999/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0833323
Date:25.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:G11B17/04
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1999/41]
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Antriebsgerät für Aufzeichnungsträger[1998/14]
English:Recording medium driving apparatus[1998/14]
French:Appareil d'entraînement de support d'enregistrement[1998/14]
Examination procedure11.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/15]
06.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2003Fee for grant paid
06.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
02.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[AP]DE19645149  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [AP] 1 * column 19, line 19 - column 20, line 3; figures 46-53 *;
 [A]DE4422997  (CLARION CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 10, line 32 - column 16, line 33; figures 7,11-21 *;
 [A]EP0644539  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 9, line 56 - column 11, line 26; figures 9,10 *;
 [A]US5500838  (MATSUMOTO MOTOYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *