Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0833135

EP0833135 - Spectrometer with a shaped oriented slit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.05.2004  [2004/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Varian, Inc.
3120 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
[2000/22]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC.
3050 Hansen Way
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chien, Ring-Ling
6428 Edgemoor Way
San Jose, California 95129 / US
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Cline, Roger Ledlie
EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Cline, Roger Ledlie
EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1SD / GB
Application number, filing date97307356.222.09.1997
[1998/14]
Priority number, dateUS1996072114826.09.1996         Original published format: US 721148
[1998/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0833135
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0833135
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/04, G01J3/18, G01J3/28
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI [1998/51]
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Spektrometer mit einem orientiert-geformten Schlitz[1998/14]
English:Spectrometer with a shaped oriented slit[1998/14]
French:Spectromètre avec une fente formée et orientée[1998/14]
Examination procedure13.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/20]
18.03.1998Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.02.2003Fee for grant paid
25.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200004   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.2000
30.09.200105   M06   Fee paid on   18.12.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
[2004/01]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5424827  (HORWITZ BRUCE A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 7 - column 3, line 28 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 14; figure 6 * [Y] 3,7-9,12;
 [YA]US5018856  (HARNLY JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 3,7-9,12 * abstract * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 21; figures 1,3 * [A] 1;
 [A]GB2204964  (ZEISS JENA VEB CARL) [A] 1,3,7-9 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5088823  (SMITH JR STANLEY B [US], et al) [A] 1,3,7-10 * column 1, line 16 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0413939  (STARK EDWARD W [US]) [A] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 10 * * column 4, line 2 - column 5, line 11; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH0694528
 [A]  - M.R. TORR ET AL., "IMAGING SPECTROMETER FOR HIGH RESOLUTION MEASUREMENTS OF STRATOSPHERIC TRACE CONSTITUENTS IN THE ULTRAVIOLET", APPLIED OPTICS., NEW YORK US, (19880201), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 619 - 626, XP002050356 [A] 1,3,7-9,12 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.27.000619
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940704), vol. 18, no. 353, Database accession no. (P - 1764)<6693> , [A] 1,8 * abstract *