Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0837494

EP0837494 - Method and apparatus for priority based scheduling of wafer processing within a multiple chamber semiconductor wafer processing tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2005  [2005/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Materials, Inc.
3050 Bowers Avenue
M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95052 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
APPLIED MATERIALS, INC.
3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061
Santa Clara, California 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Jevtic, Dusan
444 Saratoga Avenue, 34B
Santa Clara, California 95050 / US
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97307371.122.09.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateUS1996073537021.10.1996         Original published format: US 735370
[1998/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0837494
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0837494
Date:02.12.1998
[1998/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/00, G05B19/418
[1998/49]
Former International [1998/17]H01L21/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [1999/32]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur auf Priorität basierenden Planung zum Behandlung von Scheiben in einer Mehrkammervorrichtung zur Behandlung von Halbleiterwafern[1998/17]
English:Method and apparatus for priority based scheduling of wafer processing within a multiple chamber semiconductor wafer processing tool[1998/17]
French:Procédé et dispositif de planification basé sur priorité de traitement de plaquettes dans une système à plusieurs chambres de manipulation de plaquettes semi-conductrices[1998/17]
Examination procedure14.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/28]
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/28]
10.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
16.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
04.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200408   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2296818  (NEC CORPORATION) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5402350  (KLINE) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5375061  (HARA ET AL.) [A] 1,10 * column W *