Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0832744

EP0832744 - Ink-jet print apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Akahira, Makoto
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Okabe, Tetsuo
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
03 / Fujiike, Hiroshi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/14]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/14]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date97307626.829.09.1997
[1998/14]
Priority number, dateJP1996025916330.09.1996         Original published format: JP 25916396
JP1997024692811.09.1997         Original published format: JP 24692897
[1998/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0832744
Date:01.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0832744
Date:13.01.1999
[1999/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0832744
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/14, B41J2/05, B41J2/165
[1998/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1999/38]
Former [1998/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahldruckvorrichtung und Tintenstrahldruckverfahren[1998/14]
English:Ink-jet print apparatus and method[1998/14]
French:Procédé et appareil d'impression à jet d'encre[1998/14]
Examination procedure26.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/30]
19.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2003Fee for grant paid
07.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.06.2003
IT11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
ES22.09.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]FR11.06.2003
NL11.06.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/03]NL11.06.2003
ES22.09.2003
Former [2004/02]NL11.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0754553  (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [PX]EP0753766  (CANON KK [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2134045  (HOFFMANN CYKLOP) [A] 1,7,13,21 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0636485  (MATRA COMMUNICATION [FR]) [A] 1,7,13,21 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0395004  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH01122441  ;
 [A]JPS63290756  ;
 [A]EP0107502  (SANDERS ROYDEN C JUN) [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890815), vol. 013, no. 365, Database accession no. (M - 859), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890323), vol. 013, no. 118, Database accession no. (M - 806), [A] 1 * abstract *