Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0844614

EP0844614 - Optical disc reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.04.2008
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.04.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.05.2008  [2008/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
D & M Holdings, Inc.
35-1, Sagamiono 7-chome Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa 228-8505 / JP
[2007/22]
Former [2005/37]For all designated states
D & M Holdings, Inc.
35-1, Sagamiono 7-chome Sagamihara-shi
Kanagawa 228-8505 / JP
Former [2003/31]For all designated states
Denon, Ltd.
16-11, Yushima 3-chome, Bunkyo-ku
Tokyo 113-0034 / JP
Former [2003/28]For all designated states
Denon, Ltd.
16-11, Yushima 3-chome, Bunkyou-ku
Tokyo 113-0034 / JP
Former [1998/22]For all designated states
Nippon Columbia Co., Ltd.
14-14 Akasaka 4-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-11 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Usui, Shunji
34-2 Misaka 2-chome
Shirakawa, Fukushima 961 / JP
[1998/22]
Representative(s)Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/22]Hackney, Nigel John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date97307644.129.09.1997
[2002/22]
Priority number, dateJP1996032479520.11.1996         Original published format: JP 32479596
[1998/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0844614
Date:27.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0844614
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0844614
Date:30.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/10, G11B27/36, G11B19/02, G11B27/34
[1998/22]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/44]
Former [1998/22]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wiedergabegerät für optische Platte[1998/22]
English:Optical disc reproducing apparatus[1998/22]
French:Appareil de reproduction de disque optique[1998/22]
Examination procedure20.10.1997Examination requested  [2002/22]
09.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.02.2006
02.02.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
21.02.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.12.2006Fee for grant paid
15.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL30.05.2007
[2008/12]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5375106  (KAWACHI HIDEO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0663742  (LORES BORRAS CARLO [ES], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4313177  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * column 6, line 49 - column 14, line 46 *;
 [A]EP0640971  (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *;
 [A]US5199019  (MATSUMURA ASAYUKI [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 6 - column 5, line 57 *;
 [A]WO9212515  (BLAKEWAY IAN [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 23 *
ExaminationEP0346979