Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0837413

EP0837413 - Improved card reader/writer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.10.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.12.2005  [2005/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / May, David C.C.
5 Osnaburgh Court
Darsie, Fife KY15 4SU, Scotland / GB
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London
NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [2004/35]Williamson, Brian , et al
Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Former [2000/26]Williamson, Brian
Internatinal IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [1998/17]Irish, Vivien Elizabeth
International IP Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date97307659.929.09.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateGB1996002143815.10.1996         Original published format: GB 9621438
[1998/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0837413
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0837413
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0837413
Date:15.12.2004
Language:EN
[2004/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K13/08
[2004/20]
Former International [2000/22]G06K7/00, G06K7/06, G06K13/08
Former International [1998/17]G06K7/00, G06K7/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/06]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbesserter Kartenleser/-schreiber[1998/17]
English:Improved card reader/writer[1998/17]
French:Lecteur/enregistreur de cartes amélioré[1998/17]
Examination procedure30.11.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
12.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
03.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2004Fee for grant paid
13.10.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.09.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49]
Request for further processing for:09.10.2003Request for further processing filed
09.10.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.10.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XAY]EP0234654  (RADIOTECHNIQUE IND & COMM [FR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-5 [Y] 6;
 [Y]WO9417498  (ENCO TONE LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 6 * page 1, line 9 - line 19 * * page 5, line 24 - page 6, line 27 *;
 [A]EP0338848  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,6 * figure - *;
 [A]US4724310  (SHIMAMURA NORIO [JP], et al) [A] 1,6 * figure 6 *