blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0836034 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0836034



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 184
24.09.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
12.09.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
26.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
07.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.01.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.10.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.10.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Description Search / examination 9
11.04.2002 Description Search / examination 11
11.04.2002 Drawings Search / examination 3
11.04.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.04.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.04.2002 Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 26
29.01.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
29.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.01.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
28.09.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.09.2001 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
03.07.2001 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
27.01.2001 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.11.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
10.10.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
10.10.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.10.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
07.12.1999 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
06.02.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
06.02.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
03.02.1998 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
19.11.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
19.11.1997 Priority document Search / examination 48
10.11.1997 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
02.10.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
02.10.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
02.10.1997 Description Search / examination 26
02.10.1997 Drawings Search / examination 10
02.10.1997 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.10.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6