blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0836034


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.09.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  05.11.2003  [2003/45]
22.05.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
04.02.2003 Examination report or reply
29.10.2002 Renewal fee
09.10.2002 Examination report or reply
18.04.2002 Examination report or reply
24.01.2002 Examination report or reply
11.01.2002 Change - designated states published on  27.02.2002  [2002/09]
08.01.2002 Loss of particular rights
30.10.2001 Renewal fee
25.10.2001 Change - extension states
28.09.2001 First examination report
25.09.2001 Examination report or reply
14.09.2001 Loss of particular rights
28.06.2001 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
22.06.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  08.08.2001 [2001/32]
09.02.2001 Request for examination filed published on  28.03.2001 [2001/13]
31.10.2000 Renewal fee
06.10.2000 Publication of search report published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.03.2000 Surcharge for renewal fee
06.03.2000 Renewal fee
02.12.1999 Surcharge for renewal fee
27.02.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.1998 [1998/16]