blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0836034
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0836034Global Dossier 22.11.2000A3
EP0836034 15.04.1998A2
Priority number Date
US72614796 04.10.1996
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US5726512 10.03.1998A
Priority number Date
US72614796 04.10.1996