Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836034

EP0836034 - Vibration-free levitated platform [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.11.2003  [2003/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF HOUSTON
Office of University Counsel, 1600 Smith, Suite 3400 Houston
Texas 77002 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
University of Houston
Office of University Counsel, 1600 Smith, Suite 3400
Houston, Texas 77002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chu, Wei-Kan
2607 Lakecrest Drive
Pearland, Texas 77584 / US
02 / Chen, Quark Yung-Sung
2250 Holly Hall 132
Houston, Texas 77054 / US
03 / Ma, Ki-Bui
16218 Koester
Houston, Texas77040 / US
04 / Lamb, Mark Alan
4120 S Mill Avenue, Apatment J143
Tempe, Arizona 85282 / US
05 / McMichael, Chase Kenyon
6111 Winsone Lane, 71
Houston, Texas 77057 / US
06 / Tsong, Ignatius S.T.
1445 E Palamino Drive
Tempe, Arizona 85284 / US
[1998/16]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
8th Floor
1 Mann Island
Liverpool L3 1BP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]W.P. Thompson & Co.
Coopers Building, Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date97307774.602.10.1997
[1998/16]
Priority number, dateUS1996072614704.10.1996         Original published format: US 726147
[1998/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0836034
Date:15.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0836034
Date:22.11.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16F15/03, F16F15/00
[1998/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/09]
Former [2001/32]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [1998/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schwingungsfrei schwebende Plattform[1998/16]
English:Vibration-free levitated platform[1998/16]
French:Plateforme en lévitation sans vibrations[1998/16]
Examination procedure27.01.2001Examination requested  [2001/13]
23.05.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
19.09.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
28.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/45]
26.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
21.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
03.07.2001AT   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001BE   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001CH   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001DK   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001ES   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001FI   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001GR   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001IE   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001LU   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001MC   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001NL   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001PT   M01   Not yet paid
03.07.2001SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199903   M06   Fee paid on   25.02.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]JPH07274563  ;
 [PA]US5631617  (MORISHITA MIMPEI [JP]) [PA] 1 * figures 14A-14H *;
 [A]JPH08326839  ;
 [A]US5177387  (MCMICHAEL CHASE K [US], et al);
 [A]US5542506  (MCMICHAEL CHASE K [US], et al);
 [A]US5196748  (RIGNEY THOMAS K [US]);
 [PA]US5567672  (TERENTIEV ALEXANDER N [CA], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07274563 A 19951020 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08326839 A 19961210 (NIPPON STEEL CORP;MEIRITSU SEIKI KK) [A] * abstract *