blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0838760

EP0838760 - Multiple on-chip IDDQ monitors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. (A Delaware Corporation)
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto CA 94303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/41]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation)
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/32]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/31]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies Inc.
a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/14]For all designated states
Agilent Technologies, Inc.
395 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brown, Charles Allen
982 Sequoia Avenue, P.O. Box J
Corvallis, OR 97330 / US
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Carpmaels & Ransford
One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2002/30]Carpmaels & Ransford
43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [1998/18]Colgan, Stephen James, et al
CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97307780.302.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateUS1996073207716.10.1996         Original published format: US 732077
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838760
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838760
Date:17.06.1998
[1998/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838760
Date:02.01.2002
Language:EN
[2002/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.1998
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/24, G01R31/317
[1998/18]
CPC:
G01R31/318577 (EP,US); G01R31/3008 (EP,US); G01R31/3004 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/09]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Mehrere IDDQ Monitore auf einem Chip[2001/09]
English:Multiple on-chip IDDQ monitors[1998/18]
French:Plusieurs moniteurs IDDQ sur puce[1998/18]
Former [1998/18]"Mehrere-auf-einem-Chip" IDDQ Monitoren
Examination procedure26.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
08.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2001Fee for grant paid
24.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0386804  (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 9, line 2 - line 28 ** figure 9 *;
 [Y]US5343479  (KIYOZUKA NOBORU [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 58 * * column 5, line 44 - line 65 * * figure 2 *;
 [YA]EP0647905  (AT & T GLOBAL INF SOLUTION [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 4, line 6 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4,5
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.