EP0834724 - Method and apparatus for sensing and displaying torsional vibration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Drawer 1431 Duncan Oklahoma 73536 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dominick, John McEwen 24 Pitdourie Walk, Bucksburn Aberdeen, Scotland / GB | [1998/15] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/15] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97307849.6 | 03.10.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | GB19960020679 | 04.10.1996 Original published format: GB 9620679 | [1998/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0834724 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0834724 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834724 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, E21B44/00, G01H1/10 | [2000/51] | CPC: |
G01H1/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/15] | G01H1/10 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2001/36] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Erfassen und Darstellen von Torsionsschwingung | [1998/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for sensing and displaying torsional vibration | [1998/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de détection et d'affichage de vibration torsionnelle | [2003/34] |
Former [1998/15] | Procédé et dispositif de détection et d'affichage de vibration torsionnelles | Examination procedure | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Request for further processing for: | 13.03.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.04.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US6065332 (DOMINICK JOHN MCEWEN [GB]) [E] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [XA]US5273122 (HENNEUSE HENRY [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 44 * [A] 3,6; | [XA]GB2275283 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 16; figure 6 * * page 24 - page 25 * [A] 3,6; | [A]US3703096 (VITTER ALBERT L JR, et al) [A] 3,6 * column 7, line 13 - line 44 *; | [A]US4773263 (LESAGE MARC [US], et al) [A] 3,6 * claim 14 * |