blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0835630 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0835630



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 154
12.11.2003 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
28.11.2002 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.09.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
04.09.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
03.07.2002 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.06.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
25.06.2002 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.02.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.02.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
07.12.2001 Claims Search / examination 4
07.12.2001 Description Search / examination 4
07.12.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.10.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.10.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
09.10.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.09.2001 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
21.09.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
31.05.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
31.05.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.09.1999 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
04.06.1999 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
16.04.1999 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
15.04.1999 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
14.04.1999 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 2
27.08.1998 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
27.08.1998 European search report Search / examination 3
02.02.1998 Drawings Search / examination 7
02.02.1998 Request for change of name of the applicant Search / examination 2
20.01.1998 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.01.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.01.1998 Priority document Search / examination 32
06.01.1998 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
10.10.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.10.1997 Claims Search / examination 4
10.10.1997 Description Search / examination 9
10.10.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.10.1997 Drawings Search / examination 7
10.10.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7