blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0835630


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.01.2004 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.03.2004  [2004/10]
14.11.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.01.2004  [2004/01]
22.11.2002 (Expected) grant published on  08.01.2003  [2003/02]
15.11.2002 Change - designated states published on  02.01.2003  [2003/01]
30.10.2002 Renewal fee
18.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant
28.06.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.02.2002 Communication of intention to grant
10.01.2002 Examination report or reply
31.10.2001 Renewal fee
12.10.2001 Examination report or reply
12.10.2001 Change - applicant published on  28.11.2001 [2001/48]
01.06.2001 First examination report
28.05.2001 Examination report or reply
01.11.2000 Renewal fee
17.12.1999 Change - designated states published on  02.02.2000 [2000/05]
16.12.1999 Loss of particular rights
29.10.1999 Renewal fee
03.09.1999 Loss of particular rights
08.07.1999 Change - extension states
31.05.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
07.05.1999 Definitive list of designations published on  23.06.1999 [1999/25]
23.04.1999 Request for examination filed published on  09.06.1999 [1999/23]
28.08.1998 Publication of search report published on  14.10.1998 [1998/42]
27.02.1998 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.04.1998 [1998/16]