Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0835630

EP0835630 - Apparatus for dispensing toilet tissue from rolls [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.11.2003
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 03.03.2004  [2004/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
133 Peachtree Street, N.E. Atlanta
Georgia 30303 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/48]For all designated states
GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
133 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta Georgia 30303 / US
Former [1998/16]For all designated states
Fort James Corporation
P.O. Box 2218, Tredegar Street
Richmond, Virginia 23217 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grasso, Kamala J.
44 Rice Road
Wayland, MA 01778 / US
02 / Mervar, Robert
3073 NW Ashford Circle
Hillsboro, OR 97124 / US
03 / Johnson, Douglas W.
1725 Rebecca Lane
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
04 / Short, Jason E.
4 Glen Terrace
Cambridge, MA 01239 / US
05 / Moody, John R.
1229 Westbreeze Drive
Neenah, WI 54956 / US
06 / Johnson, Peter D.
28 Washbrook Road
Newtown, CT 06470 / US
[1998/16]
Representative(s)Moir, Michael Christopher , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/16]Moir, Michael Christopher , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date97308062.510.10.1997
[1998/16]
Priority number, dateUS1996072820810.10.1996         Original published format: US 728208
[1998/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0835630
Date:15.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0835630
Date:14.10.1998
[1998/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0835630
Date:08.01.2003
Language:EN
[2003/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.1998
ClassificationInternational:A47K10/38
[1998/16]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2003/01]
Former [2000/05]DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  NL 
Former [1999/25]BE,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  IE,  IT,  NL 
Former [1998/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Apparat zum Spenden von Toilettenpapier von Rollen[1998/16]
English:Apparatus for dispensing toilet tissue from rolls[1998/16]
French:Appareil de distribution de papier w.c. à partir de rouleaux[1998/16]
Examination procedure05.04.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/23]
15.04.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, GR, LI, LU, MC, PT, SE
07.09.1999Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CH
31.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.09.2002Fee for grant paid
04.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
04.06.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
04.06.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE08.01.2003
[2004/10]
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2075217  (SCHNYDER CONRAD;SCHNYDER KATRIN) [X] 1-3,5,6,13 * page 2, line 20 - line 40 * * page 9, line 1 - line 15 * * figure 6 *;
 [XA]US3010670  (JONES, V. C.; HUSS, W.S.; KRUEGER, A.S.) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 48 - line 67 * * column 3, line 38 - line 56 * * figures 3,4,8 * [A] 4,14-16;
 [A]US5265816  (COLLINS SCOTT J) [A] 4,8,14-16 * figures 2,3 *