Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838970

EP0838970 - Method for shared memory management in network nodes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2008Change - representativepublished on 12.11.2008  [2008/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Mitra, Debasis
133 Summit Ave, Apt 16
Summit, New Jersey 07901 / US
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/32]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologies NS UK Limited, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2005/24]Funnell, Samantha Jane , et al
British Technology Group Ltd. Patents Department 10 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7SB / GB
Former [1998/18]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies UK Ltd, Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date97308125.014.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateUS1996073614924.10.1996         Original published format: US 736149
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838970
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838970
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838970
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04Q11/04, H04L12/56
[2000/08]
Former International [1998/18]H04Q11/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines gemeinsamen Speichers in Netzknoten[1998/18]
English:Method for shared memory management in network nodes[1998/18]
French:Méthode de gestion de mémoire partagée dans des noeuds de réseaux[1998/18]
Examination procedure11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
28.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2006Fee for grant paid
21.11.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
21.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
18.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
20.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
23.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0706298  (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11,13,14 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 3 *;
 [X]EP0526104  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11,13,14 * column 2, line 8 - line 22 *