Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0878822

EP0878822 - Charged Particle beam exposure apparatus having a stage position measurement device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
For all designated states
ADVANTEST CORPORATION
32-1, Asahicho 1-chome Nerima-ku
Tokyo 179 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
For all designated states
Advantest Corporation
32-1, Asahicho 1-chome
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
For all designated states
Advantest Corporation
32-1, Asahicho 1-chome
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawakami, Kenichi
c/o Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
02 / Ohkawa, Tatsuro
c/o Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
03 / Ishida, Kazushi
c/o Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
04 / Tsuda, Akiyoshi
c/o Advantest Corp., 1-32-1, Asahi-cho
Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date97308205.016.10.1997
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateJP1997009224710.04.1997         Original published format: JP 9224797
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878822
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0878822
Date:11.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:H01J37/317, H01J37/304, H01J37/20, H01L21/00, G03F7/20
[1998/47]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/30]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät zur Belichtung mittels geladenem Teilchenstrahl mit einer Trägertisch-Positionsmesseinrichtung[1998/47]
English:Charged Particle beam exposure apparatus having a stage position measurement device[1998/47]
French:Appareil d'exposition par faisceau de particules chargées avec un dispositif de mesure de position d'un support porte-objet[1998/47]
Examination procedure01.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/13]
09.11.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2002Fee for grant paid
19.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
29.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]JPS62273722  ;
 [A]US4891526  (REEDS JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9600978  (LEICA CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4119854  (TANAKA KAZUMITSU, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4063103  (SUMI MASAHIKO) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0183125  (IBM [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4814625  (YABU SHUICHI [JP]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4943730  (TAKEMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS57162431  ;
 [A]JPS5754319
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880517), vol. 012, no. 162, Database accession no. (E - 609), [X] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830108), vol. 007, no. 004, Database accession no. (E - 151), [A] 1-4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820714), vol. 006, no. 128, Database accession no. (E - 118), [A] 1-4 * abstract *