Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0836819

EP0836819 - Height-adjustable chair arm assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.02.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip01.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.03.2002  [2002/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAWORTH, INC.
One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40
Holland, Michigan 49423 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
HAWORTH, INC.
One Haworth Center 1400 Highway M-40
Holland Michigan 49423 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Wilkerson, Larry A.
1340 Buth
V.E. Comstock Park, MI 49321 / US
02 / Dral, Joel Robert
5250 Old Cornelia Highway
Lula, Georgia 30554 / US
[1998/22]
Former [1998/17]01 / Wilkerson, Larry A.
1340 Buth
V.E. Comstock Park, MI 49321 / US
02 / Dral, Joel Robert
8036 Green Meadow Court
No. 24 Jenison, MI 49423 / US
Representative(s)Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Valentine, Francis Anthony Brinsley
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date97308230.816.10.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateUS1996073171217.10.1996         Original published format: US 731712
[1998/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0836819
Date:22.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0836819
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP14.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/03
[1998/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/45]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Höhenverstellbares Armlehnengefüge[1998/17]
English:Height-adjustable chair arm assembly[1998/17]
French:Ensemble d'appui-bras réglable en hauteur[1998/17]
Examination procedure01.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
24.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5439267  (PETERSON GORDY [US], et al) [A] 1,12,19 * abstract *;
 [A]US3856252  (REGIS R) [A] 2,3,5,7,13,16,20 * abstract *;
 [A]US4951995  (TEPPO DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * column 2, lines 3-5 - column 3, lines 16-46; figure 2 *;
 [A]FR1067160  (FRANZ MINET MOBELFABRIK A G) [A] 8,17 * page 1, column R, line 15 - line 37 *;
 [A]US5382079  (WILSON ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 10,18 * abstract *