Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838657

EP0838657 - Apparatuses and method for measuring the length of elongate flexible objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/18]Gauge for measuring length of flexible extrusions
[2002/45]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Lima & Western Avenues Findlay
Ohio 45840 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Lima & Western Avenues
Findlay Ohio 45840 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Malik, Richard
212 Birch Drive
Rossford, Ohio 43460 / US
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith London
W6 0LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]Warren, Anthony Robert , et al
BARON & WARREN, 18 South End, Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date97308269.617.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateUS1996073880028.10.1996         Original published format: US 738800
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838657
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838657
Date:08.03.2000
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838657
Date:25.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:G01B5/02
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/46]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtungen und Verfahren zur Messung der Länge von länglichen flexiblen Objekten[2002/45]
English:Apparatuses and method for measuring the length of elongate flexible objects[2002/45]
French:Dispositifs et procédé pour la mesure de la longeur d'objets allongés[2002/45]
Former [1998/18]Längenmessvorrichtung für extrudierte Objekte
Former [1998/18]Gauge for measuring length of flexible extrusions
Former [1998/18]Dispositif de mesure de la longueur d'extrusions
Examination procedure07.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
17.09.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.02.2003Fee for grant paid
21.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.11.200105   M06   Fee paid on   23.11.2001
31.10.200206   M06   Fee paid on   07.04.2003
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.06.2003
IT25.06.2003
ES22.12.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2004/28]BE25.06.2003
ES22.12.2003
Former [2004/13]ES22.12.2003
Documents cited:Search[XA]US4562743  (BONINE RICHARD L [US]) [X] 3 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 3 * * column 4, line 42 - column 6, line 40; figures 1-7 * [A] 1,2,4-6;
 [A]US4604813  (KAWANAMI SHUMPEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US5097617  (CRAVEN GENE C [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3328885  (SEBASTIEN FRINDEL) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 25; figure 3 *