Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0841294

EP0841294 - Suspended load steadying control device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.07.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.09.2005  [2005/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/39]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Former [1998/20]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.
5-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Toyohara, Takashi, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
6-22, Kan-On-Shin-Machi 4-chome, Nishi-Ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
02 / Kouno, Susumu, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
6-22, Kan-On-Shin-Machi 4-chome, Nishi-Ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
03 / Hoshina, Hiromitsu, Mitsubishi Heavy Ind., Ltd.
6-22, Kan-On-Shin-Machi 4-chome, Nishi-Ku
Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima / JP
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/20]Cross, Rupert Edward Blount , et al
BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street
London EC4A 1PQ / GB
Application number, filing date97308303.320.10.1997
[1998/20]
Priority number, dateJP1996029604808.11.1996         Original published format: JP 29604896
[1998/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0841294
Date:13.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0841294
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0841294
Date:22.09.2004
Language:EN
[2004/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:B66C13/06, B66C13/46
[2000/02]
Former International [1998/20]B66C13/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1998/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Regeleinrichtung zum Halten von hängenden Lasten[1998/20]
English:Suspended load steadying control device[1998/20]
French:Dispositif de commande de la stabilisation pour une charge suspendue[1998/20]
Examination procedure27.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/20]
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.2004Fee for grant paid
15.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.06.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0668237  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-5; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5550733  (YUN JI-SEOP [KR], et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 5; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0611211  (CAILLARD [FR]) [A] 1,2 * figures 10,11; claims 1,2,11-13,15 *;
 [A]FR2704847  (BERTIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1-4; claims 1,3,9 *;
 [A]DE3513007  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 3,18 *