Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0838523

EP0838523 - RsbW-1 derived from Staphylococcus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 27.03.2002  [2002/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court Brentford
Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC
New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Fosberry, Andrew P., c/o SmithKline Beecham Pharm.
New Frontiers Science Park South
Third Avenue, Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB
02 / Lawlor, Elizabeth, SmithKline Beecham Pharm.
1250 South Collegeville Road, P O Box 5089
Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426-0989 / US
03 / Nicholas, Richard O., SmithKline Beecham Pharm.
1250 South Collegeville Road, P O Box 5089
Collegeville, Pennsylvania 19426-0989 / US
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/24]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise , et al
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1998/18]Connell, Anthony Christopher , et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
Application number, filing date97308478.323.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateUS19960029052P24.10.1996         Original published format: US 29052 P
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838523
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838523
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C07K14/31, C07K16/12, C12Q1/68, G01N33/50, C07H21/00, A61K31/70, A61K39/085
[1998/18]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:RsbW-1 aus Staphylococcus[1998/18]
English:RsbW-1 derived from Staphylococcus[1998/18]
French:RsbW-1 dérivé de Staphylococcus[1998/18]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
01.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0786519  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US]) [PX] 1-3,7 * SEQ ID NOs 714,836 *;
 [X]  WU S ET AL, "Sigma-B, a putative operon encoding alternate sigma factor of Staphylococcus aureus RNA polymerase: molecular cloning and DNA sequencing", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY,US,WASHINGTON, DC, (199610), vol. 178, no. 20, ISSN 0021-9193, page 6036-6042, XP002103953 [X] 1-13 * figures 2,3,4C *
 [PX]  KULLIK I ET AL, "The alternative sigma factor sigmaB in Staphylococcus aureus: regulation of the sigB operon in response to growth phase and heat shock", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, (199702), vol. 167, pages 151 - 159, XP000852845 [PX] 1-13 * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002030050428
 [X]  KALMAN S ET AL, "Similar organization of the sigB and spoIIA operons encoding alternate sigma factors of Bacillus subtilis RNA polymerase", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1990), vol. 172, pages 5575 - 5584, XP002122905 [X] 1-3,7 * figures 1-3 *