blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0838893

EP0838893 - Power source apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.11.2004
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.01.2005  [2005/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/03]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Former [1998/18]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagahara, Kiyokazu
Sony Denshi Corp., 3-1, Tsujidohshinmachi 3-chome
Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1998/18]
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John, et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/18]Nicholls, Michael John, et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97308603.628.10.1997
[1998/18]
Priority number, dateJP1996028541428.10.1996         Original published format: JP 28541496
[1998/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0838893
Date:29.04.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0838893
Date:02.06.1999
[1999/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0838893
Date:14.01.2004
Language:EN
[2004/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:H02M1/10, H02M3/337
[1998/18]
CPC:
H02M1/10 (EP,US); H02M3/3376 (EP,US); H02M5/22 (KR);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/07]
Former [1998/18]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stromversorgungsgerät[1998/18]
English:Power source apparatus[1998/18]
French:Alimentation de puissance[1998/18]
Examination procedure05.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
17.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2003Fee for grant paid
05.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.10.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4656571  (UMEZU KENJI [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0477883  (GOLD STAR CO [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US5119283  (STEIGERWALD ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.