Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0856964

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
Examination procedure09.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted12.10.2005
Opposition procedure13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit published on 20.09.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.08.1998 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:05.08.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;RO;SI
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 04J 3/14 A, 7H 04J 3/16 B, 7H 04Q 11/04 B, 7H 04J 14/02 B
 
Event date:30.08.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000706
 
Event date:27.09.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB
 
Event date:12.10.2005 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB
 
Event date:12.10.2005 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:23.02.2006 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69734346
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20060223
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:07.07.2006 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:20.09.2006 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20060713
 
Event date:31.01.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20071025
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20071009
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20071031
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:24.06.2009 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20081031
 
Event date:24.07.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
Effective DATE:20090630
 
Event date:31.08.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20090501
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081031
 
Event date:30.11.2009 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20081031