Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0856964

EP0856964 - Optical path signal termination equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2006
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.09.2006  [2006/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-19 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/41]For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-19 / JP
Former [1998/32]For all designated states
NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION
19-2 Nishi-Shinjuku 3-chome
Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-19 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okamoto, Satoru
9-2-12 Sugita, Isogo-ku, Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 235 / JP
02 / Satou, Kenichi
1950-21 Mutsuura-cho, Kanazawa-ku, Yokohama-shi
Kanagawa 236 / JP
[1998/32]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/32]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date97308784.431.10.1997
[1998/32]
Priority number, dateJP1996030211213.11.1996         Original published format: JP 30211296
[1998/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0856964
Date:05.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/32]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0856964
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0856964
Date:12.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04J3/14, H04J3/16, H04Q11/04, H04J14/02
[2000/03]
Former International [1998/32]H04J3/14, H04J9/00, H04J14/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [1998/32]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Beendigung eines optischen Pfades[1998/32]
English:Optical path signal termination equipment[1998/32]
French:Dispositif de terminaison d'une voie optique[1998/32]
Examination procedure06.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
20.04.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.08.2005Fee for grant paid
09.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
15.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0543327  (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-16 * column A * * column 4, line 4 - column 5, line 10 *
 [X]  - HWU C ET AL, "INTERNATIONAL GATEWAY FOR SDH AND SONET INTERCONNECTION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE (GLOBECOM), NEW YORK, US, IEEE, ISBN 0-7803-1821-8, page 725-734, XP000488638 [X] 1-16 * abstract * * part 1 * * part 2 * * page 733, column 1, line 6 - page 734, column 1, line 10 *
 [A]  - BRIERE S ET AL, "SDH/SONET INTERWORKING: END-TO-END SDH SERVICES PROVIDED OVER SONETRINGS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON EUROPEAN FIBRE OPTIC COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKS (EFOC), XP000603568 [A] 1-16 * summary * * page 67, column 2, line 1 - page 68, column 1, line 33 *